+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On October 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.408
On October 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Substituted for s7241a
- 3rd reading cal.981
- Passed senate
- Returned to assembly
On June 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.205
- Rules report cal.205
- Reported
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On June 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 9579a
- Amend and recommit to ways and means
On May 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On May 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
+ − Vote
June 12, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: - Jun 12, 2014
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
Details:
+
−
- José Rivera: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor