+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.133
On July 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Cal.1344
- Substituted For S7657
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On May 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 9579a
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.809
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
June 6, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor