+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S7775
- Rules Report Cal.327
- Reported
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On February 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9574c
- Amend And Recommit To Real Property Taxation
On February 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9574b
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Real Property Taxation
On January 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9574a
- Amend And Recommit To Real Property Taxation
On January 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor