+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.268
On June 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.988
- Substituted For S7756
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On May 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.570
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
May 10, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor