+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.704
On May 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Consumer Affairs And Protection