+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S6746a
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.226
- Rules Report Cal.226
- Reported
On June 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9522a
- Amend And Recommit To Transportation
On January 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor