+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On July 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.84
On July 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.828
- Substituted for s7223
- Referred to transportation
On June 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.96
- Rules report cal.96
- Reported
On June 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On May 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to transportation
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor