+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9506c
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On June 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9506b
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9506a
- Amend And Recommit To Governmental Operations
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor