+ − Summary
+ − Actions (14)
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.52
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.726
- Substituted For S7502
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On March 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.17
- Rules Report Cal.17
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On January 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
+ − Vote
March 22, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 1