+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.45
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.175
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Judiciary
On February 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Election Law
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor