+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On September 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.338
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- Home rule request
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading cal.1565
- Substituted for s7386
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
- Home rule request
On June 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.200
- Rules report cal.200
- Reported
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to ways and means
+ − Vote
June 20, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: - Jun 20, 2014
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
Details:
+
−
- José Rivera: yea
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor