+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by s7026a
On June 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.199
- Rules report cal.199
- Reported
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On June 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 9446a
- Amend and recommit to ways and means
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to real property taxation
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor