+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On December 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Approval memo.20
- Signed chap.502
On December 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.1613
- Substituted for s7112
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On June 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.304
- Rules report cal.304
- Reported
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On April 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to banks
+ − Vote
June 19, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: - Jun 19, 2014
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
Details:
+
−
- José Rivera: yea