+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On September 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.351
On September 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.404
- Substituted For S7014
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On March 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.447
On March 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
+ − Vote
June 16, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor