+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.120
On July 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.1019
- Substituted for s7313
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to cultural affairs, tourism, parks and recreation
On June 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading 9387b
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.722
On May 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 9387a
- Amend (t) and recommit to ways and means
- Reported referred to ways and means
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor