+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.303
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1408
- Substituted For S6816a
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.235
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.235
- Delivered To Senate
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9376a
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On February 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Economic Development
+ − Vote
June 17, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor