+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On November 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
- Signed Chap.608
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
- 3rd Reading Cal.1640
- Substituted For S3723a
On May 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.420
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.420
- Delivered To Senate
- Home Rule Request
- Passed Assembly
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
On May 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On February 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
+ − Vote
June 2, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor