+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.124
On July 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.930
- Substituted For S7226
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On May 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.614
On May 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Vote
June 14, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor