+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On December 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.499
On December 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.798
- Substituted for s6998
- Referred to civil service and pensions
On June 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.720
On May 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to governmental employees
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor