+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S6874a
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.693
On May 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9313c
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On March 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9313b
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On March 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9313a
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On February 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor