+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.212
On August 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- Home rule request
- 3rd reading cal.688
- Substituted for s6945
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
- Home rule request
On June 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.192
- Rules report cal.192
- Reported
On June 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to ways and means
+ − Vote
June 19, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: - Jun 19, 2014
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
Details:
+
−
- José Rivera: yea