+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.457
On November 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1061
- Substituted For S6630
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On February 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.410
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
June 8, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3