+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.259
On June 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
- 3rd Reading Cal.1558
- Substituted For S8246a
On May 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.471
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.471
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Delivered To Senate
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On April 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9269a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Governments
On February 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
+ − Vote
June 2, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 18
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor