+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to elections
On June 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.777
On May 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 9244b
- Amend and recommit to election law
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 9244a
- Amend and recommit to election law
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to election law
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor