+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On December 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Approval memo.17
- Signed chap.497
On December 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.1222
- Substituted for s7433
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to agriculture
On May 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.659
On May 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On March 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to aging
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor