+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.411
On October 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.244
- Substituted For S6465
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.552
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
+ − Vote
June 7, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor