+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S6389a
On March 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.427
On March 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor