+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On December 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Tabled
- Vetoed memo.548
On December 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.1502
- Substituted for s7716
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to civil service and pensions
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On June 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.189
- Rules report cal.189
- Reported
On June 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On April 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On March 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to governmental employees
+ − Vote
June 18, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: - Jun 18, 2014
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
Details:
+
−
- José Rivera: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor