+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.291
On November 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On July 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
- 3rd Reading Cal.995
- Substituted For S8494
On July 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.188
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.188
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Delivered To Senate
On July 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On July 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On July 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9154a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Governments
On January 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
+ − Vote
July 22, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor