+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S6322a
On May 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.807
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9104a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Codes
On January 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor