+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On July 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.114
On July 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.791
- Substituted for s6802
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to civil service and pensions
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
- Home rule request
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.712
On May 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to governmental employees
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor