+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to codes
On April 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.547
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On March 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to judiciary
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor