+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S8085c
- Rules Report Cal.552
- Reported
On May 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reference Changed To Ways And Means
On May 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9046b
- Amend And Recommit To Transportation
On May 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9046a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Transportation
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor