+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.445
On November 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.1675
- Substituted for s7387a
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.465
- Rules report cal.465
On June 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
- Reported
On June 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Held for consideration in ways and means
On June 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 9021d
- Amend and recommit to ways and means
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 9021c
- Amend and recommit to ways and means
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On May 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 9021b
- Amend (t) and recommit to health
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 9021a
- Amend and recommit to health
On March 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to health
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsors (16)
Davila
Type:
Primary Sponsor