+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S7140
On June 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.175
- Rules Report Cal.175
- Reported
On June 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor