+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.59
On April 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On March 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Message Of Necessity - 3 Day Message
- Reported Referred To Rules
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.23
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.23
- Motion To Lay Upon The Table Lost
- Motion To Amend Lost
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
- Substituted For S6407c
- 3rd Reading Cal.515
- Message Of Necessity - 3 Day Message
- Passed Senate
- Returned To Assembly
On March 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9007c
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Ways And Means
On March 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9007b
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Ways And Means
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 9007a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Ways And Means
On January 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
+ − Vote
March 31, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62