+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On June 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.63
On May 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.12
- Substituted For S7284
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On February 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.682
On February 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Vote
February 28, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor