+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S7170
On February 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.433
On February 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On January 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor