+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S6938
On January 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.372
On January 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Veterans' Affairs
On January 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Veterans' Affairs