+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.210
On August 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.793
- Substituted for s6824
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to civil service and pensions
On June 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.775
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On March 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to governmental employees
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor