+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On November 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed Memo.56
- Tabled
On October 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1008
- Substituted For S7034
On June 9, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Rules Report Cal.84
- Reported Referred To Rules
- Reported
- Delivered To Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.84
- Passed Assembly
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reference Changed To Ways And Means
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On December 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
+ − Vote
July 23, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor