+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to investigations and government operations
On January 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.54
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to investigations and government operations
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.293
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to ways and means
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor