+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.48
On May 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.43
- Substituted For S7315
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On February 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On February 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.644
On February 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
+ − Vote
February 28, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor