+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On July 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On July 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.317
- Rules Report Cal.317
- Reported
On July 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On July 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On July 1, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 8900b
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Transportation
On January 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 8900a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Transportation
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On December 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor