+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On May 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.844
On May 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 8886a
- Amend And Recommit To Housing
On January 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing