+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On August 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.268
On August 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.699
- Substituted for s2742b
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to higher education
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading 8867a
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.708
On May 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to higher education
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor