+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S7792
On February 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.407
On February 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor