+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Tabled
- Vetoed memo.499
On November 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.1082
- Substituted for s6659a
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to finance
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On May 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.832
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 8835a
- Amend (t) and recommit to ways and means
On February 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On February 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to mental health
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor