+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to elections
On March 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On March 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading 8823a
On February 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.478
On February 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to election law
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor