+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading 881a
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.53
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to civil service and pensions
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.81
On March 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to governmental employees
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor